Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Greathouse, Eddie, Greathouse, Eddie And Meredith, Greathouse, Meredith, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Singh, Neil V, Esq., against Typtap Insurance Company, represented by Prior, Charles M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Video Deposition
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline 03-04-2024 at 10:30 AM |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Privilege Log |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.