Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sevgili Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Weires, Scott A, against Accurate Dimensions Inc., represented by Daniels, Richard Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Accurate Dimensions Inc. |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Accurate Dimensions Inc. |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF, SEVGILI LLC'S, COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Accurate Dimensions Inc. |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 19th day of October, 2022 Ernest W. Duncan |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC NONE |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Accurate Dimensions Inc. |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Amount: $100,001.00 |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.