Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Whitaker, Kathy Lynn, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Wood, Michael John, Esq., against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Critelli, Sheri Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaury, William W., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 28, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT S REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COMPREHENSIVE MEDICAL EXAMINATIONParty: Plaintiff Whitaker, Kathy Lynn |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORDParty: Plaintiff Whitaker, Kathy Lynn |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Medical Examination | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Video Deposition | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Video Deposition | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.