Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brown, Steven, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Zubkoff, Jeremy, against Fagien, Steven, Herman, Scott, represented by Clancy, Ryan Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
eSummons Issuance
Date: October 04, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Interrogs | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial Calendar Call will be 12-15-2023 9:00 AM in Courtroom Zoom |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation PRETRIAL STIPULATIONParty: Plaintiff Brown, Steven Defendant Herman, Scott |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Party: Defendant Herman, Scott Defendant Fagien, Steven |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.