Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cwiklik, Joseph, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Huskey, James David, Jr., against Brenda D. Forman, In Her Official Capacity As Brow, Castle Credit Co Holdings, Llc, Florida Department Of Revenue, Forman, Brenda D., Nunes, Jose A., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryReal Prop Comm Fore >$50K - <$250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment
Date: January 06, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: October 19, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: December 20, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 14, 2023Default
Date: January 10, 2023Order of Default
Date: January 06, 2023Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: July 14, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 21, 2022Affidavit of Proof of Publication
Date: September 13, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: August 10, 2023Default
Date: January 10, 2023Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: January 23, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 23, 2023Answer to Complaint
Date: October 14, 2022Default
Date: January 10, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: August 22, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: August 10, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: September 18, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 16, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: February 08, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: October 14, 2022Proof of Publication
Date: September 05, 2023Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 12, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: October 04, 2023Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Motion to Reset Sale Date
Date: October 09, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: October 10, 2023Ord Setting/Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: November 03, 2023Ord Setting/Resetting Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 14, 2023eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: October 09, 2023Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: November 03, 2023Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: November 14, 2023eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Non-Military Affidavit
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: September 26, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: September 30, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: September 30, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale February 27,2024 |
|
November 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ord Setting/Resetting Foreclosure Sale reset for February 27, 2024 |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale Party: Plaintiff Cwiklik, Joseph |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ord Setting/Resetting Foreclosure Sale November 21, 2023 |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reset Sale Date Party: Plaintiff Cwiklik, Joseph |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.