Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilson, Aston, Wilson, Heather, Wilson, Vanessa, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Butz, Kyle, Esq., against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Arrington, Eric A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 23, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 23, 2022Request to Produce
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Service
Date: October 27, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: November 09, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 09, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 23, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 05, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: November 28, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 12, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 13, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 14, 2022Privilege Log
Date: December 20, 2022Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 20, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: December 22, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: December 30, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: December 22, 2022Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: December 23, 2022Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: December 23, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 18, 2023Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: February 28, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 02, 2023Case Management Order
Date: March 27, 2023Motion
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served Records Custodian, World Kitchen Cabinet 01/23/2023 |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served Records Custodian, Watermen Plumbing, Inc. c/o Yosef Wassermann, Registered Agent, |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served on the 10th day of January, 2023 at 1 :20 pm-JOHN HORNBUCKLE, C/O COMPASS CLAIMS CONSULTANTS |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served Records Custodian, Alder Adjusting |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served 23rd day of December, 2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.