Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ortega, Karina M, Ortega, Robert, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Barimo, Elise, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Poterek, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.