Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brooks, Valerie, filed a(n) case represented by Chisholm, Michael E, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Poterek, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Appearance
Date: October 10, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: October 12, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served SERVED ALLIE VALERO ON JULY 24th 2023 |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued By Attorney Allie Valero |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Allie Valero |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served TRAVIA BALDEO FIVE STAR CLAIMS ADJUSTING |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Plaintiff Brooks, Valerie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.