Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barrera, Tatiana, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Chavin, Valorie S, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Levins, Elizabeth E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFahnestock, Fabienne E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 23, 2022Interrogatories
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Barrera, Tatiana |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Uniform Trial Order for Circuit Civil 1st Party Prop Loss CALENDAR CALL: 12-18-2023 at 10:00 AM |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Trial Party: Plaintiff Barrera, Tatiana |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.