Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jean-Baptiste, Durlene C, Jean-Baptiste, Gasby, filed a(n) case represented by Sanders, Magali J, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Farkas, Joshua Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOlefson, Shari Africk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery RESPONSESParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.