Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Andriano, Philip, filed a(n) case represented by Reyer, Sarah Danielle, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Goldman, Hailey, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 23, 2022Request to Produce
Date: September 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order 03-17-2023 11:00 AM |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Plaintiffs Motion is hereby GRANTED |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time TO COMPLY W/ COURT ORD AND PRESERVE OBJECTIONS REGARDING DF'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.