Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nguyen, Quoc, Quoc Nguyen And Thi Van Ngoc Ly, Thi Van Ngoc Ly, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Mora, Erika Maria, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Tuch, Hiriana R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSinger, Michele Towbin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 23, 2022Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: November 23, 2022Request for Production
Date: November 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.720Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720Party: Plaintiff Nguyen, Quoc Plaintiff Thi Van Ngoc Ly |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Setting Mediation | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Uniform Trial Order for Circuit Civil 1st Party Prop Loss CALENDAR CALL: 02-01-2024 |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Nguyen, Quoc Plaintiff Thi Van Ngoc Ly |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.