Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust, A Delaware Statutory Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Penson, John L, against Ers Inc, Pompano Springs Hoa, Inc., A Florida Not For Prof, Shah, Vashanti, represented by Bialczak, Daniel W, Giuliano, Nicole W, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Garcia-Wood, Marina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia-Wood, Marina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2022 |
CategoryReal Prop Nonhomestead Res Fore>$50K - <$250K |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Order Approving Settlement
Date: August 28, 2023Notice of Dropping Party(S)
Date: September 27, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Settlement Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 2 pages Instrument Number 119071348 |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Motion Party: Plaintiff Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust, a Delaware Statutory Tr |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation Party: Plaintiff Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust, a Delaware Statutory Tr |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Avoidance of Affirmative Defenses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.