Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Usa Chiropractic And Rehab Inc, filed a(n) * Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 case represented by Petion, Fesner, against Windhaven Insurance Company, represented by Carabotta, Jill, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with McCarthy, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCarthy, Kathleen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2012 |
Category* Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Motion to Consolidate
Date: June 04, 2015Motion
Date: April 02, 2013Motion
Date: April 16, 2013Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 19, 2013Motion
Date: April 19, 2013Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 22, 2013Response to Request for Production
Date: April 22, 2013Answer to Interrogs
Date: April 22, 2013Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 25, 2013Motion for Leave to File
Date: April 25, 2013Proposal of Settlement
Date: August 23, 2013Motion
Date: October 13, 2014Subpoena Filed
Date: August 26, 2013Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: November 24, 2014Motion
Date: December 02, 2014Order Granting Motion
Date: December 08, 2014Motion
Date: November 26, 2014Motion for Leave to File
Date: December 26, 2014Motion
Date: March 17, 2015Notice of Filing
Date: March 17, 2015Notice of Filing
Date: November 23, 2016Objection
Date: June 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: GOOD CAUSE AFFIDAVIT OF FESNER PETION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SHOWING OOD CAUSE | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Showing Good Cause | |
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lack of Prosecution December 6, 2016 @ 9:30 am Room 410 |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation JUNE 9, 2015, AT 1:00 P.M |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate Party: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | OBJECTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERParty: Defendant Windhaven Insurance Company | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF MATERIAL MIREPRESENTATIONParty: Plaintiff USA Chiropractic and Rehab Inc |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing DEFENDANT'S POLICY OF INSURANCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF MATERIAL MISREPRESENTATIONParty: Plaintiff USA Chiropractic and Rehab Inc |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Taking Deposition of the Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.