Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cross Creek Patio Homes Owners Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Valancy, Steven S, against Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Gaber, Bernice C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Cohen, Mardi Levey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohen, Mardi Levey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2012 |
Category* Foreclosure + - Foreclosure =$5000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 23, 2013Motion for Final Judgment
Date: May 01, 2013Consent to Extend Foreclosure Sale
Date: June 25, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE FOR 7/12/13. CLERK TO RESET |
|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Consent to Extend Foreclosure Sale | |
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale 7/12/13Party: Plaintiff Cross Creek Patio Homes Owners Association Inc |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Copies Mailed to All Parties; JGMT/NSDB consent sent to atty |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment of Foreclosure including award of Attorneys fees and costsParty: Plaintiff Cross Creek Patio Homes Owners Association Inc |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit as to: BERNICE C. GABER |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Party: Defendant Gaber, Bernice C |
|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication & Not of Filing Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.