Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Domond Advanced Chiropractic Inc, filed a(n) * Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 case represented by Feinman, Michael, against Mga Ins Co Inc, represented by Leiter, Steven J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Kanner, Daniel J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKanner, Daniel J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2012 |
Category* Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: February 03, 2014Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: June 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing June 02, 2014 @ 2:00pm Rm425 On Df's Mot for Final Summary Judgment |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOFParty: Defendant MGA Ins Co Inc |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF DEPOSITION / MGA Insurance Company, INC |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Subpoena served |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Andre Mesinor |
|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement Party: Defendant MGA Ins Co Inc |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Plaintiff |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability December 20 2012 through January 3 2013 Steven J Leiter Esq |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Defendant |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.