Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Meir, David, Meir, Sara, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shanbron, Candise L, against Citizens Property Ins Corp, represented by Lux, Andrea J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Lee, Robert W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee, Robert W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 18, 2013Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: January 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Sara Meir and David Meir |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Designated Corporate Representative for Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Objection & rspns to Df Req for Prod - Pl. Rcvd 2/15/13 |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogs Pl Unverified. Rcvd 2/15/13 |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log Defendant |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories (unverified) |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production to Plaintiff (First |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.