Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Joseph, Emmanuel, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Klotzman, Scott Eric, against Citizens Property Ins Corp, represented by Baros, Grant A, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Cohen, Mardi Levey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohen, Mardi Levey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal W/PrejParty: Plaintiff Joseph, Emmanuel |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 09/14/12Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: KLOTZMAN, SCOTT ERIC ; Userid: CTS-scallenius ; Receipt: 20121YF1A006381; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.