Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Care Rehabilitation Center Pllc, filed a(n) * Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 case represented by Feinman, Michael Sander, against Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois, represented by Murphy, John J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Lee, Robert W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee, Robert W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2012 |
Category* Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Compliance AND AUTHORITY |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation March 7, 2014 at 2:00p.m |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Order Denying Pl's Motion for Pl's Rep to Appear by Telephone at the Mediation |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion on Df's Motion for claim rep to telephonically attend Mediation |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Plaintiff First Care Rehabilitation Center PLLC |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff First Care Rehabilitation Center PLLC |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Referring Case to Mediation County Court |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Defendant's Motion to Transfer & Consolidate is Granted in Part & Denied in Part; The Case 12-1283 COCE (51) wil be Transferred to Division 53 and Consolidated only for Discovery Purposes |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Defendant's Motion to Transfer & Consolidate is Granted in Part & Denied in Part; The Case 12-1284 COCE (54) wil be Transferred to Division 53 and Consolidated only for Discovery Purposes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.