Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Strike C, Llc, Strike X Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Conforti, Colby Grossman, Zarco, Roberto, against Gulfstream Park Racing Association Inc, Stronach, Belinda, Village At Gulfstream Park, Llc, represented by Kreitzer, Michael N, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Tuter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTuter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
eSummons Issuance
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Village At Gulfstream Park, LLC Defendant Gulfstream Park Racing Association Inc Defendant Stronach, Belinda |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
March 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPLEMENTAL TATEMENT OF FACTS AND OBJECTION TO INADMISSIBLE SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCEParty: Defendant Village At Gulfstream Park, LLC |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Strike X LLC |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for In-Camera Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.