Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jenkins, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Columna Inc, represented by Topkin, Sanford Roy, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillips, Carol-Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a Petition for Equitable Distribution filed by Patricia Jenkins against Columna, Inc., a Florida Profit Corporation doing business as Roush Spine. The petitioner, represented by her attorney, states that she sustained personal injur...
Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 30, 2021Agreed Order
Date: April 07, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 09, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: September 01, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 06, 2022Case Management Order
Date: January 06, 2022Order Setting
Date: April 05, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 02, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 25, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order for Equitable Distribution |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CALENDAR CALL: 09-01-2022 |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order on 03-30-2022 at 8:45 AM Courtroom 15175 or Zoom |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order 02-04-2022 10:00 AM |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Columna Inc |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 08-27-2021 dba ROUSH SPINE RA THOMAS ROUSHParty: Defendant Columna Inc |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 27th day of August, 2021Party: Defendant Columna Inc |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Columna Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.