Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Doreste, Claircilia, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Garcia, Francisco Octavio, against American Security Insurance Company, represented by Zaslow, Andrew Jay, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Claircilia Doreste against Defendant American Security Insurance Company. The action seeks an amount in excess of $30,000. The Plaintiff is a resident of Broward County, Florida, and the Defendant is an insurance ...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 24, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 24, 2021Copy of Correspondence
Date: August 24, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 24, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 29, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: January 21, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 11, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: October 29, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 11, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: October 29, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Doreste, Claircilia |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEENDANT |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint DEFENDANT, AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY's ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPAINTParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERYParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.