Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jameison, Karen, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mustell, Charles, Esq., against Family Dollar Stores Of Florida Llc, represented by Samuel, Sherilee J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 24, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Florida LLC |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 08/26/21Party: Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Florida LLC |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC NONE |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Jameison, Karen |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Jameison, Karen |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Jameison, Karen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.