Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Florez, Sandra, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Rodriguez, Marcus Rafael, against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Boyer, Scott, Lavigne, Donald Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFahnestock, Fabienne E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Motion to Compel
Date: June 13, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 28, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.