Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
South Broward Hospital District, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Koff, Chelsea Emma, Koff, Chelsea, Esq., against Elizabeth M Fernandez Md, New Day Women'S Healthcare Llc, New Day Womens Healthcare Llc, represented by Deruelle, Paullette Christine, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBowman, John B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time OF DEADLINE FOR DF'S RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Elizabeth M Fernandez MD Defendant New Day Women's Healthcare LLC |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Elizabeth M Fernandez MD Defendant New Day Women's Healthcare LLC |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 4th day of September, 2021Party: Defendant New Day Women's Healthcare LLC |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served September 4, 2021Party: Defendant Elizabeth M Fernandez MD |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff South Broward Hospital District |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Elizabeth M Fernandez MD |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant New Day Womens Healthcare LLC |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Amount: $30,001.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.