Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcclain, Susan Lynne, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Chappel, Adam Christopher, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Romaelle, Kameron Derrick, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFahnestock, Fabienne E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Susan Lynne McClain against State Farm Florida Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges breach of contract and demands a jury trial. The da...
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 24, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 24, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 24, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 22, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 24, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: February 18, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 21, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: March 14, 2022Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: March 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Stay | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S PROPOUNDED DISCOVERYParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FLA. STAT. 627.70152Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC NONE |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff McClain, Susan Lynne |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff McClain, Susan Lynne |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff McClain, Susan Lynne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.