Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Liberis, Simson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Moreau, Lucas T, against Brown, Curtis, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Brust, Steven E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference on 02-16-2023 9:15 AM |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference https://17thllcourts.zoom.us/j/111475745 of the Broward County Courthouse, 201 SE 6th Street, Ft Lauerdale, FL 33301 on 02-13-2023 9:15 AM |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Bifurcate Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Plaintiff Liberis, Simson |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Non Objection to Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.