Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Colado, Jose, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Silverstein, Darryn L, against Geico General Insurance Company, Tarallo, Lisa, represented by Lawson, Jennifer P, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 23, 2021Request for Production
Date: December 14, 2021Case Management Order
Date: December 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time DEFENDANT GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY S MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE STANING UNIFORM TRIAL ORDERParty: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.