Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burgher, Aubrey, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Tarich, Manny Menashe, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Fouts, Paulette Renee, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Aubrey Burgher against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The complaint alleges breach of contract by the defendant. The plaintiff purchased a homeowner's insurance policy from the defendant, which provided coverage f...
Notice of Mediation
Date: June 18, 2022Notice
Date: October 21, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Issued By Attorney SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Burgher, Aubrey | |
June 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S PLEADINGS |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request to Produce | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.