Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Curtis, Selma, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ilani, Daniel Moshe, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Smith, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 23, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 23, 2021Notice
Date: August 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 31, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: September 09, 2021Request
Date: September 09, 2021Request to Produce
Date: September 09, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 13, 2021Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 15, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 20, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 29, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 11, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 11, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 12, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 13, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 19, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 22, 2021Notice
Date: October 28, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 02, 2021Notice
Date: October 28, 2021Privilege Log
Date: November 02, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 02, 2021Re-Notice
Date: November 04, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 22, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 06, 2021Ex Parte Motion
Date: December 09, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 10, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 27, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 27, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 19, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: February 04, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 20, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 04, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: January 20, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 17, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 17, 2022Response to Request for Copies
Date: March 21, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: April 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.