Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lemmon, Jr., Jack, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Hoekstra Jr, Robert H, against Academy Bus Llc, Brazzel, Travis D., Franmar Leasing Llc.,, Rodriguez, Nelson D., Sherwood Food Distributors Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Rosenberg, Jonathan I, Sarasua, Nicole M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 02, 2021Motion
Date: October 12, 2021Amended Motion
Date: October 15, 2021Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 02, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: November 09, 2021Request for Production
Date: November 09, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 09, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 21, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 20, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 20, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 20, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 27, 2021eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: December 27, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 27, 2021eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: December 27, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: January 19, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: January 24, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 02, 2022Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: February 04, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 08, 2022Agreed Order
Date: February 08, 2022Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: March 09, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 15, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 09, 2022Order Granting Motion
Date: March 26, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 09, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 26, 2022Request for Production
Date: June 09, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 09, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
March 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for leave to file an amended answer |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.