Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gomez, Catherine, James, Rachel, Loffredo, Johanna, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Collins-Cruz, Iris, against Rudd, Levi, Symmetry Healthcare Management Llc., represented by Henry, David Steven, Esq., Levine, Todd Alan, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 21, 2021eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: October 13, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERYParty: Defendant Rudd, Levi Defendant Symmetry Healthcare Management LLC. | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Produce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.