Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dorvil, Clediner Supreme, Gibson, Ellianna Anastacia, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by De La Noval, Lazaro Luis, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Arcia, Felix J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Receipt
Date: August 23, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Case Transfer
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFFS' COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER JULY 12, 2022Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.