Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Abdulla, Alia, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against Lexington Insurance Company, represented by Cohen, Douglas, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 18, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 18, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Plaintiff Abdulla, Alia |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Lexington Insurance Company |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Wednesday, July 21,2021Party: Defendant Lexington Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.