Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bel, Gregory R, against Sistla, Shiva S, Zenith Rollers Llc, represented by Metzner, Michael L, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 17, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 17, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Defendant Zenith Rollers LLC Defendant Sistla, Shiva S |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Party: Defendant Zenith Rollers LLC Defendant Sistla, Shiva S |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Compel | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel ARBITRATIONParty: Defendant Zenith Rollers LLC Defendant Sistla, Shiva S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.