Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sousa, Cindia, Sousa, Hector, filed a(n) 3 case represented by O'Brien, Kathleen M, against People'S Trust Insurance Company, represented by Hodges, Blake R., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 17, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 17, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Placing Case on Inactive Status | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline 02-06-2023 at 10:00 AM JURY |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
October 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Compel | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Sousa, Hector Plaintiff Sousa, Cindia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.