Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mihandoust, Armin, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Snyder, Marguerite, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Trushin, Bradley H., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOlefson, Shari Africk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Armin Mihandoust against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interest, court c...
eSummons Issuance
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT'S MOTIONParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Answer ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Mediation DATE: August 24,2022 TIME: 10:00 A.M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.