Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Grey, Hyacinth, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Davis, Jelani Charles, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Hunter, Brian Charlton, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Hyacinth Grey, against the Defendant, State Farm Florida Insurance Company. The Plaintiff is seeking damages greater than $30,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney's fees. The Defendant is a Florida...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference on 09-01-2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom Zoom |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served INGRID NAVAS 08/19/2022 |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Jury Instructions Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Verdict Form Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL STIPULATIONParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.