Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reid, Linva, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Reynolds, Robert A., Esq., against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Goldman, Hailey, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 17, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time AND MOTION TO PRESERVE OBJECTIONSParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Wednesday, July 21,2021Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO NONE |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Amount: $50,001.00 |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production To DefendantParty: Plaintiff Reid, Linva |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions To DefendantParty: Plaintiff Reid, Linva |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Robert A Reynolds Esq Atty for Plaintiff |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.