Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Perea, Juvenal, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by De Prado, Joe R, against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company, represented by Cruz-Bustillo, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Juvenal Perea against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect, with a policy number of HSV-0010379-03, which provided coverage for the property locat...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 16, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTParty: Defendant Southern Fidelity Insurance Company |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS TO COUNT 1Party: Defendant Southern Fidelity Insurance Company |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Southern Fidelity Insurance Company |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Southern Fidelity Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.