Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Paulette, Dennis, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gonzalez, Robert Francis, Esq., against Peoples Trust Insurance Company, represented by Long, Ryan Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Dennis Paulette against People's Trust Insurance Company. The jurisdiction and venue for this action are in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks monetary damages in excess of $30,000, excluding interest, costs, and ...
Request to Produce
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 16, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 16, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 16, 2021Certificate of Compliance
Date: June 17, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 14, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: July 29, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: August 13, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: August 09, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 18, 2021Case Management Order
Date: November 02, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 29, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: November 18, 2021Notice for/of Trial
Date: January 03, 2022Order Setting
Date: December 02, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 05, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 29, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: May 06, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: July 14, 2021Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: December 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice for/of Trial | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.