Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rancano, Janet, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Weisser, Kevin Joshua, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by Martin, Deborah S, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint was filed by Janet Rancano against Fednat Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges breach of contract and seeks damages exceeding $30,000. The plaintif...
eSummons Issuance
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF DEPOSITION |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Rancano, Janet |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance & DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Fednat Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.