Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dms Investment Management Co Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Straub, Charles, Esq., against Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Corporation, represented by Gillinov, Melissa A, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillips, Carol-Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 08, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 10, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: August 10, 2021Case Management Order
Date: February 08, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order 04-08-2022 10:00 AM |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Corporation |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Corporation |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Corporation |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO NONE |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.