Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barreau, Mimose, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Roe, William Joseph, against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Bakas, Marta K, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Management Order
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 24, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served June 16,2021Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Unserved REJECTED PROCESS NON-SERVE D UNABLE TO SERVE COMPLAINT-MISSING |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO none |
|
May 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Party: Defendant Safepoint Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.