Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mota, Krechian, Mota, Victor, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Eisler, Marilyn, Segal, Pamela, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Batchelor, Kandia Nataki, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Request for Admissions
Date: May 29, 2021Request for Production of Documents
Date: May 29, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 29, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 29, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 29, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 29, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Service
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 23, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 28, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: September 21, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 04, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 08, 2021Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: November 15, 2021Notice
Date: January 04, 2022Case Management Order
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: March 02, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 26, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Strike | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Witness List | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION AND FOR SANCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.