Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilson, Donna, Wilson, Michael, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Berges, Otto E., Berges, Otto E, against Centauri Specialty Insurance Company, represented by Kaplan, Jonah D., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 28, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Party: Plaintiff Wilson, Michael Plaintiff Wilson, Donna |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDAR CALL: 12-16-2022 |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Cause for Trial AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORTParty: Plaintiff Wilson, Michael Plaintiff Wilson, Donna |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Centauri Specialty Insurance Company |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference on 12-07-2021 9:00 AM room 16170 or Zoom |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.