Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wesley, Johnathan, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Narchet, Christopher Anthony, Esq., against Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S Of London Subscribing To Policy Number Nphoars000308, Underwriters At Lloyd'S London Subscribing To, represented by Levy, Lauren D, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSinger, Michele Towbin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: July 24, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Service
Date: June 09, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Copies
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 02, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 14, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 21, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 16, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: July 21, 2021Response to Motion
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 23, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: July 22, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: July 23, 2021Objection to Notice Production Under Rule 1.351
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: July 28, 2021Order Granting Motion to Strike
Date: July 24, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: July 30, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: July 30, 2021Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 10, 2021Order
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 11, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: September 27, 2021Response to Motion
Date: September 29, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: September 28, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 29, 2021Order Denying
Date: September 30, 2021Motion for Default
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 30, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: September 30, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 08, 2021Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: October 05, 2021Request for Production
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 12, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: October 14, 2021Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: October 11, 2021Notice of Non-Objection
Date: October 11, 2021Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: October 11, 2021Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: October 26, 2021Response to Motion
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 05, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 27, 2021Order Granting Motion to Strike
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: November 02, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 08, 2021Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: November 11, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: November 01, 2021Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 19, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: November 05, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 05, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 23, 2021Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: November 11, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: November 25, 2021Order Granting Motion to Strike
Date: November 25, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 01, 2021Objection
Date: December 07, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 06, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 15, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: December 15, 2021Pre-Trial Catalog
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: December 20, 2021Witness List
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: January 13, 2022Order Granting
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Wesley, Johnathan |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Catalog | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAParty: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number NPHOARS000308 |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number NPHOARS000308 |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number NPHOARS000308 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.