Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zhang, Hardy Q, Zhang , Janet L, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Perez, Nelson A, Esq., against Edison Insurance Company, represented by Barzyk, Michael F, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Request for Production of Documents
Date: May 28, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: July 08, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: July 19, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 29, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 29, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: July 29, 2021Privilege Log
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 09, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: September 19, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 19, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 19, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 12, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 02, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 18, 2021Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: November 11, 2021Agreed Order
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 20, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 23, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 01, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: December 28, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: January 21, 2022Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: February 03, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 03, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: December 17, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 07, 2022Certificate
Date: July 12, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 17, 2022Notice
Date: June 03, 2022Mediation Report
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: June 09, 2022Witness List
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: September 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement ADN REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM HEARING DOCKETParty: Plaintiff Zhang, Hardy Q Plaintiff Zhang , Janet L |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATIONParty: Defendant Edison Insurance Company |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF COUNSEL AND CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSParty: Plaintiff Zhang, Hardy Q Plaintiff Zhang , Janet L |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Edison Insurance Company |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.