Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mitchell, Kathryn, filed a(n) Other case represented by Hiraldo, Manuel S, against Broward Automotive Inc.,, represented by Paretti, Kenneth L, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillips, Carol-Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: June 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTParty: Defendant Broward Automotive Inc., |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.