Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brennan, John M, against Haller & Haller, Inc, Haller, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 20, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Default & Default
Date: July 20, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 28, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2021Final Disposition Form
Date: October 19, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: July 20, 2021Case Management Order
Date: September 09, 2021Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: July 20, 2021Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2021Default
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: September 21, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: August 19, 2021Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Bankruptcy Case No. 23-11760-LMI |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default againstParty: Defendant Haller, Timothy |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff TD Bank, N.A. |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Tax Costs Party: Plaintiff TD Bank, N.A. |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Attorney Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.